THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:06:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tigchelaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 71277 ) Dr. S. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 69972 )
Business Address: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-1825

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tigchelaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 71277 ) Dr. S. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 69972 )
Business Address: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-1825

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY CLARK TIGCHELAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGCHELAAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY CLARK TIGCHELAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGCHELAAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997