THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4567
Fax: (416) 595-5826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu (CPSO#: 70088 ) Dr. A. Gershon (CPSO#: 70115 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4567
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4758

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4567
Fax: (416) 595-5826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu (CPSO#: 70088 ) Dr. A. Gershon (CPSO#: 70115 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4567
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4758

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996