THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:32:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu (CPSO#: 70088 ) Dr. A. Gershon (CPSO#: 70115 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4567
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4758

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu (CPSO#: 70088 ) Dr. A. Gershon (CPSO#: 70115 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4567
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4758

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA SARA GERSHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSHON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA SARA GERSHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSHON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996