THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 08:43:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 176 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 8N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-821-6638
Fax: 519-821-5834

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pasion (CPSO#: 71223 ) Dr. R. Helyar (CPSO#: 70202 )
Business Address: 80 James St W
Guelph ON N1G 1E6
5193624763

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 176 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 8N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-821-6638
Fax: 519-821-5834

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pasion (CPSO#: 71223 ) Dr. R. Helyar (CPSO#: 70202 )
Business Address: 80 James St W
Guelph ON N1G 1E6
5193624763

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GEOFFREY HELYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELYAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GEOFFREY HELYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELYAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996