THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:21:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Shelldale Cres
Guelph ON N1H 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198216638
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Downey Road
Downey Road Medical
Guelph Ontario N1G 1A2
Phone: (519) 827-9779
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pasion (CPSO#: 71223 ) Dr. R. Helyar (CPSO#: 70202 )
Business Address: 80 James St W
Guelph ON N1G 1E6
5193624763

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Shelldale Cres
Guelph ON N1H 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198216638
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Downey Road
Downey Road Medical
Guelph Ontario N1G 1A2
Phone: (519) 827-9779
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pasion (CPSO#: 71223 ) Dr. R. Helyar (CPSO#: 70202 )
Business Address: 80 James St W
Guelph ON N1G 1E6
5193624763

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STELLA RODRIGUEZ PASION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STELLA RODRIGUEZ PASION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997