THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 07:35:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-5511
Fax: (613) 969-5561
Address: 115 Barrack street
Kingston ON
Kingston Ontario K7K 1G2
Phone: 613-549-1440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 28 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gammal (CPSO#: 70207 ) Dr. M. Montalvo (CPSO#: 71490 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-5511
Fax: (613) 969-5561
Address: 115 Barrack street
Kingston ON
Kingston Ontario K7K 1G2
Phone: 613-549-1440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 28 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gammal (CPSO#: 70207 ) Dr. M. Montalvo (CPSO#: 71490 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA THERESE GAMMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA THERESE GAMMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996