THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:15:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: stratford general hospital
dept of emergency medicine
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Extension: 2455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 christina St. N.
Sarnia Ontario N7V 3C2
Phone: 519 337 3261
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 730 st Andrew street
Stratford Ontario N5A 1A3
Phone: (519) 271-2180
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Masella (CPSO#: 71491 ) Dr. M. MacIsaac (CPSO#: 70549 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: stratford general hospital
dept of emergency medicine
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Extension: 2455
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 christina St. N.
Sarnia Ontario N7V 3C2
Phone: 519 337 3261
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 730 st Andrew street
Stratford Ontario N5A 1A3
Phone: (519) 271-2180
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Masella (CPSO#: 71491 ) Dr. M. MacIsaac (CPSO#: 70549 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996