THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:40:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: Masella, JoAnn Stephanie (Used Until: 14 Jul 1998)
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Extension: 3247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Masella (CPSO#: 71491 ) Dr. M. MacIsaac (CPSO#: 70549 )

General Information

Former Name: Masella, JoAnn Stephanie (Used Until: 14 Jul 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Extension: 3247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Masella (CPSO#: 71491 ) Dr. M. MacIsaac (CPSO#: 70549 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANN STEPHANIE MASELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANN STEPHANIE MASELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997