THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cummings (CPSO#: 71070 ) Dr. A. Gray (CPSO#: 71331 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652
Business Address: Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
(613) 549-7477
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cummings (CPSO#: 71070 ) Dr. A. Gray (CPSO#: 71331 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652
Business Address: Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
(613) 549-7477
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD GEORGE CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD GEORGE CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997