THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 10:01:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 275 Bagot St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-7477
Fax: (613) 344-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cummings (CPSO#: 71070 ) Dr. A. Gray (CPSO#: 71331 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652
Business Address: Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
(613) 549-7477
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 275 Bagot St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-7477
Fax: (613) 344-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cummings (CPSO#: 71070 ) Dr. A. Gray (CPSO#: 71331 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652
Business Address: Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G4
(613) 549-7477
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AILEEN ANN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AILEEN ANN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997