THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 00:32:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: Reichard Segal, Galit (Used Until: 11 Oct 1999) Reichard, Galit (Used Until: 19 Aug 1999)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G & S Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Segal (CPSO#: 71114 ) Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 71168 )
Business Address: Suite 201
235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1S8
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 490 Harry Walker Drive
Unit 4
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
(905) 881-3984

General Information

Former Name: Reichard Segal, Galit (Used Until: 11 Oct 1999) Reichard, Galit (Used Until: 19 Aug 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G & S Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Segal (CPSO#: 71114 ) Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 71168 )
Business Address: Suite 201
235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1S8
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 490 Harry Walker Drive
Unit 4
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
(905) 881-3984

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GALIT REICHARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GALIT REICHARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997