THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:17:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-490 Harry Walker Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 898-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1J8
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G & S Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Segal (CPSO#: 71114 ) Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 71168 )
Business Address: Suite 201
235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1S8
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 490 Harry Walker Drive
Unit 4
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
(905) 881-3984

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-490 Harry Walker Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 898-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1J8
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G & S Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Segal (CPSO#: 71114 ) Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 71168 )
Business Address: Suite 201
235 Eagle Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 1S8
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 490 Harry Walker Drive
Unit 4
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6X6
(905) 881-3984

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN HOWARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN HOWARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997