THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:50:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl-Andre Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferrand (CPSO#: 71139 ) Dr. K. Lalonde (CPSO#: 73424 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl-Andre Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferrand (CPSO#: 71139 ) Dr. K. Lalonde (CPSO#: 73424 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE GERMAINE FERRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE GERMAINE FERRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997