THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18596
Fax: 613-761-4757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl-Andre Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferrand (CPSO#: 71139 ) Dr. K. Lalonde (CPSO#: 73424 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18596
Fax: 613-761-4757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl-Andre Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferrand (CPSO#: 71139 ) Dr. K. Lalonde (CPSO#: 73424 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 18596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL-ANDRE ROGER LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL-ANDRE ROGER LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999