THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:57:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076845101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Phone: 807 346-1440
Fax: 807 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Harris (CPSO#: 71388 ) Dr. C. Cheng (CPSO#: 71164 )
Business Address: 105-984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1440 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076845101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Phone: 807 346-1440
Fax: 807 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Harris (CPSO#: 71388 ) Dr. C. Cheng (CPSO#: 71164 )
Business Address: 105-984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1440 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIACHEN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIACHEN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997