THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:52:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Harris (CPSO#: 71388 ) Dr. C. Cheng (CPSO#: 71164 )
Business Address: 105-984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1440 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Harris (CPSO#: 71388 ) Dr. C. Cheng (CPSO#: 71164 )
Business Address: 105-984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1440 Extn: 2

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALEXANDER HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALEXANDER HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997