THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:58:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A 280
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jetty (CPSO#: 77465 ) Dr. P. Jetty (CPSO#: 71462 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5555 Extn: 13812
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Counselling Services
2600 CTTC Building
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TELUGU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A 280
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jetty (CPSO#: 77465 ) Dr. P. Jetty (CPSO#: 71462 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5555 Extn: 13812
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Counselling Services
2600 CTTC Building
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASAD JETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASAD JETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997