THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:22:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University
Health and Counselling Services
CTTC Building Suite 2600
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jetty (CPSO#: 77465 ) Dr. P. Jetty (CPSO#: 71462 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5555 Extn: 13812
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Counselling Services
2600 CTTC Building
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University
Health and Counselling Services
CTTC Building Suite 2600
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jetty (CPSO#: 77465 ) Dr. P. Jetty (CPSO#: 71462 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5555 Extn: 13812
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Counselling Services
2600 CTTC Building
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDIP KAUR JETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDIP KAUR JETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002