THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:52:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Armed Forces Medical College, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32846
Fax: (519) 663-2957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taneja (CPSO#: 71867 ) Dr. G. Marwaha (CPSO#: 80623 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 2C4
(519) 631-2030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Armed Forces Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32846
Fax: (519) 663-2957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taneja (CPSO#: 71867 ) Dr. G. Marwaha (CPSO#: 80623 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 2C4
(519) 631-2030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI TANEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANEJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI TANEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANEJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Armed Forces Medical College, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1997