THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:32:37 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taneja (CPSO#: 71867 ) Dr. G. Marwaha (CPSO#: 80623 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 2C4
(519) 631-2030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taneja (CPSO#: 71867 ) Dr. G. Marwaha (CPSO#: 80623 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 2C4
(519) 631-2030

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2004