THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nalanda Medical College, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute Mental Health
550 Wellington Road
London,On.
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Extension: 47581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 936-1166
Fax: (519) 913-4395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 71882 ) Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 73383 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 936-1166
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Nalanda Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute Mental Health
550 Wellington Road
London,On.
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Extension: 47581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 936-1166
Fax: (519) 913-4395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 71882 ) Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 73383 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 936-1166
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHAY KUMAR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHAY KUMAR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nalanda Medical College, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1997