THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:02:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 33282
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 71882 ) Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 73383 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 936-1166
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 33282
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 71882 ) Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 73383 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 936-1166
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999