THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586 8808
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 586-3216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joyce (CPSO#: 76556 ) Dr. J. Kingdom (CPSO#: 72096 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
600 University Avenue
Suite 3-9043-904
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8764

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586 8808
Extension: 2
Fax: (416) 586-3216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joyce (CPSO#: 76556 ) Dr. J. Kingdom (CPSO#: 72096 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
600 University Avenue
Suite 3-9043-904
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8764

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES PETER KINGDOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGDOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES PETER KINGDOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGDOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1998