THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 16:04:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (416) 785-8324

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joyce (CPSO#: 76556 ) Dr. J. Kingdom (CPSO#: 72096 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
600 University Avenue
Suite 3-9043-904
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8764

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (416) 785-8324

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joyce (CPSO#: 76556 ) Dr. J. Kingdom (CPSO#: 72096 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
600 University Avenue
Suite 3-9043-904
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8764

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001