THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:32:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-8920 Woodbine Ave
The Jacobs Pain Centre
Markham ON L3R 9W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamensky Rudnikoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jamensky (CPSO#: 74894 ) Dr. J. Rudnikoff (CPSO#: 72185 )
Business Address: The Jacobs Pain Centre
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8208

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-8920 Woodbine Ave
The Jacobs Pain Centre
Markham ON L3R 9W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamensky Rudnikoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jamensky (CPSO#: 74894 ) Dr. J. Rudnikoff (CPSO#: 72185 )
Business Address: The Jacobs Pain Centre
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8208

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDANA SHARI RUDNIKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDNIKOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDANA SHARI RUDNIKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDNIKOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998