THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:44:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-491-0615
Fax: (905) 889-6096

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamensky Rudnikoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jamensky (CPSO#: 74894 ) Dr. J. Rudnikoff (CPSO#: 72185 )
Business Address: The Jacobs Pain Centre
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8208

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-491-0615
Fax: (905) 889-6096

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamensky Rudnikoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jamensky (CPSO#: 74894 ) Dr. J. Rudnikoff (CPSO#: 72185 )
Business Address: The Jacobs Pain Centre
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8208

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL THOMAS JAMENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMENSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL THOMAS JAMENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMENSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On May 3, 2022, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Neil Jamensky in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2009.
 
The decision is under appeal.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On May 3, 2022, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Neil Jamensky in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2009.
 
The decision is under appeal.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000