THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stevens (CPSO#: 83976 ) Dr. G. Caza (CPSO#: 72485 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stevens (CPSO#: 83976 ) Dr. G. Caza (CPSO#: 72485 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGOIRE FRANCOIS CAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGOIRE FRANCOIS CAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998