THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:21:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Gatineau et Hull
909 boul la V‚rendrye
Gatineau, Quebec
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 88 Waglisla Street
R W Large Memorial Hospital
Bella Bella BC V0T 1Z0
Phone: 250 957-2314
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 140 Prom Du Portage
Canadian pension plan and disability directorate
ESDC
Gatineau QC K1A 0J9
Phone: Médical advisor
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2101 32 St
Vernon Jubilee Hospital
Vernon BC V1T 5L2
Phone: 250-545-2211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stevens (CPSO#: 83976 ) Dr. G. Caza (CPSO#: 72485 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Gatineau et Hull
909 boul la V‚rendrye
Gatineau, Quebec
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 88 Waglisla Street
R W Large Memorial Hospital
Bella Bella BC V0T 1Z0
Phone: 250 957-2314
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 140 Prom Du Portage
Canadian pension plan and disability directorate
ESDC
Gatineau QC K1A 0J9
Phone: Médical advisor
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2101 32 St
Vernon Jubilee Hospital
Vernon BC V1T 5L2
Phone: 250-545-2211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stevens (CPSO#: 83976 ) Dr. G. Caza (CPSO#: 72485 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIISA H STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIISA H STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2006