THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 09:05:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Critical Care
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3654
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lai (CPSO#: 72948 ) Dr. S. Dhanani (CPSO#: 72660 )
Business Address: CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3654

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Critical Care
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3654
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lai (CPSO#: 72948 ) Dr. S. Dhanani (CPSO#: 72660 )
Business Address: CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3654

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONNY DHANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONNY DHANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998