THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:45:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1770 Woodward Drive
Suite 100
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 755-2095
Fax: (613) 731-6201
Address: 210 Melrose Avenue
Grimes Lodge - Main Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: 75 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 72771 ) Dr. D. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 77992 )
Business Address: CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2824
Business Address: Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 100 - 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1770 Woodward Drive
Suite 100
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 755-2095
Fax: (613) 731-6201
Address: 210 Melrose Avenue
Grimes Lodge - Main Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: 75 BruyŠre Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 72771 ) Dr. D. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 77992 )
Business Address: CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2824
Business Address: Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 100 - 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARUN KUMAR RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARUN KUMAR RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998