THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 07:18:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tennankore, Dhenuka Kannan (Used Until: 21 Jun 2004)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cheo
Room W1402
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2824
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 72771 ) Dr. D. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 77992 )
Business Address: CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2824
Business Address: Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 100 - 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

General Information

Former Name: Tennankore, Dhenuka Kannan (Used Until: 21 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cheo
Room W1402
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2824
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 72771 ) Dr. D. Radhakrishnan (CPSO#: 77992 )
Business Address: CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2824
Business Address: Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 100 - 1770 Woodward Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3J2
(613) 755-2095
Business Address: 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHENUKA KANNAN RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHENUKA KANNAN RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002