THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164697777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kargel (CPSO#: 73398 ) Dr. K. Mah-Poy (CPSO#: 73984 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164697777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kargel (CPSO#: 73398 ) Dr. K. Mah-Poy (CPSO#: 73984 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS JASON KARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS JASON KARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999