THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:04:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Health Centre
7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7424
Fax: (416) 867-3654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kargel (CPSO#: 73398 ) Dr. K. Mah-Poy (CPSO#: 73984 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Health Centre
7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7424
Fax: (416) 867-3654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kargel (CPSO#: 73398 ) Dr. K. Mah-Poy (CPSO#: 73984 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN MAH-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH-POY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN MAH-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH-POY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999