THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Montag and Gold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Montag (CPSO#: 76516 ) Dr. P. Gold (CPSO#: 73532 )
Business Address: 200-118 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
519-364-2820

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Montag and Gold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Montag (CPSO#: 76516 ) Dr. P. Gold (CPSO#: 73532 )
Business Address: 200-118 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
519-364-2820

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA DIANE GOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA DIANE GOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999