THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:55:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Montag and Gold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Montag (CPSO#: 76516 ) Dr. P. Gold (CPSO#: 73532 )
Business Address: 200-118 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
519-364-2820

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Montag and Gold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Montag (CPSO#: 76516 ) Dr. P. Gold (CPSO#: 73532 )
Business Address: 200-118 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
519-364-2820

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY JOSEPH JAMES MONTAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY JOSEPH JAMES MONTAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001