THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan (CPSO#: 73606 ) Dr. S. Mehrain (CPSO#: 74864 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200
Business Address: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-1990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan (CPSO#: 73606 ) Dr. S. Mehrain (CPSO#: 74864 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200
Business Address: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-1990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANIL VINODE NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANIL VINODE NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999