THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Downie Street
Perth Sexual health clinic
Stratford Ontario N5A 1W5
Phone: 5192717600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan (CPSO#: 73606 ) Dr. S. Mehrain (CPSO#: 74864 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200
Business Address: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-1990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Downie Street
Perth Sexual health clinic
Stratford Ontario N5A 1W5
Phone: 5192717600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan (CPSO#: 73606 ) Dr. S. Mehrain (CPSO#: 74864 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8200
Business Address: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-1990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN MEHRAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN MEHRAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000