THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:37:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 497-2650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gelman (CPSO#: 76466 ) Dr. G. Gelman (CPSO#: 73709 )
Business Address: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880
Business Address: 404 - 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1P2
(416) 489-3273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 497-2650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gelman (CPSO#: 76466 ) Dr. G. Gelman (CPSO#: 73709 )
Business Address: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880
Business Address: 404 - 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1P2
(416) 489-3273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY DAVID GELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY DAVID GELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999