THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Abrahamsohn, Tara Deborah (Used Until: 06 Nov 2001)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164893273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gelman (CPSO#: 76466 ) Dr. G. Gelman (CPSO#: 73709 )
Business Address: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880
Business Address: 404 - 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1P2
(416) 489-3273

General Information

Former Name: Abrahamsohn, Tara Deborah (Used Until: 06 Nov 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164893273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gelman (CPSO#: 76466 ) Dr. G. Gelman (CPSO#: 73709 )
Business Address: Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 497-0880
Business Address: 404 - 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1P2
(416) 489-3273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA DEBORAH GELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA DEBORAH GELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001