THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7318
Fax: (613) 696-7244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Froeschl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Froeschl (CPSO#: 79689 ) Dr. M. Froeschl (CPSO#: 73862 )
Business Address: Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
(867) 979-7347
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite 1289
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4049

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7318
Fax: (613) 696-7244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Froeschl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Froeschl (CPSO#: 79689 ) Dr. M. Froeschl (CPSO#: 73862 )
Business Address: Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
(867) 979-7347
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite 1289
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4049

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PIERRE VOLKER FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PIERRE VOLKER FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999