THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:18:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fischer, Sandra (Used Until: 29 Jun 2004)
Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Froeschl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Froeschl (CPSO#: 79689 ) Dr. M. Froeschl (CPSO#: 73862 )
Business Address: Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
(867) 979-7347
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite 1289
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4049

General Information

Former Name: Fischer, Sandra (Used Until: 29 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Froeschl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Froeschl (CPSO#: 79689 ) Dr. M. Froeschl (CPSO#: 73862 )
Business Address: Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
(867) 979-7347
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite 1289
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4049

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003