THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A3915
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74906 ) Dr. M. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74703 )
Business Address: A3915-800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-5295

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A3915
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74906 ) Dr. M. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74703 )
Business Address: A3915-800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-5295

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SUSMOY SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SUSMOY SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000