THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:37:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: Volokhov, Irina (Used Until: 04 Jul 2005)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd East, A3-917
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Strathroy General Hospital
395 Carrie St
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
Phone: 519-245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74906 ) Dr. M. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74703 )
Business Address: A3915-800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-5295

General Information

Former Name: Volokhov, Irina (Used Until: 04 Jul 2005)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd East, A3-917
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Strathroy General Hospital
395 Carrie St
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
Phone: 519-245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74906 ) Dr. M. Sanatani (CPSO#: 74703 )
Business Address: A3915-800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-5295

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRINA SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRINA SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000