THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Rm A10-223
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3344
Fax: (519) 663-3220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome (CPSO#: 76415 ) Dr. M. Beaton (CPSO#: 74849 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3344
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Rm A10-223
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3344
Fax: (519) 663-3220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome (CPSO#: 76415 ) Dr. M. Beaton (CPSO#: 74849 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3344
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN BEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN BEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000