THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 08:44:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site Room E1 102
Emergency Medicine Associates
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Urgent Care Clinic
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome (CPSO#: 76415 ) Dr. M. Beaton (CPSO#: 74849 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3344
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site Room E1 102
Emergency Medicine Associates
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Urgent Care Clinic
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome (CPSO#: 76415 ) Dr. M. Beaton (CPSO#: 74849 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3344
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT EDWARD ARTHUR COOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT EDWARD ARTHUR COOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001