THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Hamilton Ontario L8V1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denkers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 74909 ) Dr. M. Denkers (CPSO#: 79247 )
Business Address: Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
(905) 333-5100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East 5th Floor North
Room 531
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2S2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Hamilton Ontario L8V1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denkers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 74909 ) Dr. M. Denkers (CPSO#: 79247 )
Business Address: Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
(905) 333-5100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East 5th Floor North
Room 531
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2S2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JEAN SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JEAN SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000