THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:56:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-310 Limeridge Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 755-7775
Fax: (905) 527-6360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denkers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 74909 ) Dr. M. Denkers (CPSO#: 79247 )
Business Address: Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
(905) 333-5100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East 5th Floor North
Room 531
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2S2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-310 Limeridge Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 755-7775
Fax: (905) 527-6360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denkers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 74909 ) Dr. M. Denkers (CPSO#: 79247 )
Business Address: Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
(905) 333-5100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East 5th Floor North
Room 531
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2S2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT DENKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENKERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT DENKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENKERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003