THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:42:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geddes Medical Group
Unit 102
54 Victoria St
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gower Kapasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gower (CPSO#: 75018 ) Dr. H. Kapasi (CPSO#: 74994 )
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 54 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-2224
Business Address: 801 St. David Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geddes Medical Group
Unit 102
54 Victoria St
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gower Kapasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gower (CPSO#: 75018 ) Dr. H. Kapasi (CPSO#: 74994 )
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 54 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-2224
Business Address: 801 St. David Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSANALI ASGARALI KAPASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSANALI ASGARALI KAPASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000