THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geddes Medical Group
Unit 102
54 Victoria St
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gower Kapasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gower (CPSO#: 75018 ) Dr. H. Kapasi (CPSO#: 74994 )
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 54 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-2224
Business Address: 801 St. David Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geddes Medical Group
Unit 102
54 Victoria St
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gower Kapasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gower (CPSO#: 75018 ) Dr. H. Kapasi (CPSO#: 74994 )
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Address: 54 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-2224
Business Address: 801 St. David Street
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHRYN GOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHRYN GOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000