THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 09:08:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipolletti Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyke (CPSO#: 75135 ) Dr. A. Cipolletti (CPSO#: 77918 )
Business Address: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipolletti Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyke (CPSO#: 75135 ) Dr. A. Cipolletti (CPSO#: 77918 )
Business Address: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT KEITH DYKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT KEITH DYKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000